open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:19-11462
    Party Name:Rheinard George Kahmar, Jr and Patricia Lea Kahmar
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [Notice of Case Reassignment]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [Minute Order Requesting Case Reassignment]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [(auto) Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution - no funds]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:June 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [CCC / FMC dates]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goddard, Ginger D. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?301828
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =