open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:19-11448
    Party Name:Steven M Johnson and Sarah Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Extend/Reduce Time]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Reaffirmation Agreement Note - Chambers]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Reaffirmation Agreement Approving/Denying]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coffey, Kevin M. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?301814
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =