Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:19-11009-M
    Party Name:Melinda Sue Griffin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Notice Regarding Revised Official Forms]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Payment Advices Certification]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kirtley, Scott P. [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income - Form 122A-1/Exemption Presumption of Abuse - Form 122A-1Supp]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.oknb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?148523
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =