open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:19-30108-dwh7
    Party Name:Misty Blue Morrow
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Discharging Debtor(s) - NADWA]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Receipt of Final Filing Fee Installment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Installment Fee Payment (FINAL)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Installment Fee Payment]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Pay Filing Fees in Installment(s)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Eiler, Kenneth S [Pay Filing Fee in Installments [Requires LBF 110 - 12/1/13]]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.orb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?498956
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =