open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:19-30475-dwh13
    Party Name:Douglas James Hybertsen and Amanda Blythe Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Supplemental Compensation [May Require LBF 1307 - 12/1/15]]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Record of Proceeding (Hearing Held)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Relief from Stay (All Motions)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Notice of Hearing Set SCU]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Notice of Intent to Sell/Refinance/Encumber]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Relief from Stay [Requires LBF 720 - 12/1/18; 720.80 - 12/1/18; 1124 - 12/1/18]]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Striking Document]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Notice of Pre-Confirmation Ch 12/13 Amendment of Plan [Requires LBF 1355.05 - 12/1/17]]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Service of Document]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Order and Notice Re: Time to File Documents]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Godare, Wayne [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.orb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?499657
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =