open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Oregon
    Case Number:19-61172-tmr7
    Party Name:Jody Robert Orlando and Linda Elayne Orlando
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amborn, Candace [Discharging Debtor(s) - DC7]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amborn, Candace [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amborn, Candace [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amborn, Candace [xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amborn, Candace [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amborn, Candace [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.orb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?501345
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =