open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:18-cv-00212
    Party Name:SMITH v. WETZEL et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment (Rule 58)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Consent/DJO form]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Habeas Petition]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Answer]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion & Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suspense Order]
    Date Published:December 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Habeas Corpus Service]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returned Mail]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:July 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record - Prisoner]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Prisoner State Record]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?476576
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =