open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cr-00418-6
    Party Name:USA v. WHITFIELD et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Support]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Permit]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Permit]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Transfer]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?466453
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =