open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00670
    Party Name:PFAFF et al v. MURPHY JEWELERS OF POTTSVILLE, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:September 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Points for Charge]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Verdict Sheet]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Call]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?487082
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =