open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-05216
    Party Name:HARVEY A. KALAN, M.D., INC. et al v. KORESKO FINANCIAL LP et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Entry - Multicase]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Plan]
    Date Published:November 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reinstate]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reinstate]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?495572
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =