open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00685
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOGACHEV et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Permanent Injunction]
    Date Published:November 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Fugitive Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Modify]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?216780
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =