open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:13-cv-05599
    Party Name:HAINES v. COLVIN
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?217294
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =