open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:14-cr-00012-1
    Party Name:USA v. KUSHIMO et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release/Reduced Sentence pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stay]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Fugitive Order]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:September 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255) - Court Users]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Tentative Findings]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interim Payment]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Set Off Calendar]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set Off Calendar]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Revoking Bond]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:October 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Exclude]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Production of Jencks Material]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exclude]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jencks Material]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw]
    Date Published:July 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief 2 (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Depart from Guidelines]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Revoke]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Required)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?215348
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =