open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:14-20671-
    Party Name:Christopher A. Clark
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [none]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Reopen and Request to Restrict Public Access to Claim - PAWB Form 37 - CLOSED CASE]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Ch 13 UST Form 13-FR-S -batch-]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Approving Report of Receipts and Disbursements]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Discharge Eligibility - Ch 13]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set on Trustee Application]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Report of Receipts and Disbursements - Plan Completed]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Terminate Wage Attachment]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Order -Non-motion related-]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Withdrawal -for attorney use-]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Directing Debtors To File a Notarized Affidavit Or a Ntc of Prop Mod Cnf Pln and Amd Pln]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Default Dismissal -batch-]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Notice of Claims Filed And Intention to Pay Claims -batch-]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Compensation]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on Amended Plan]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - PAWB Form 10]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Conference Continued]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Sell Property]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Proof of Publication of Notice of Sale]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Response]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing Set F]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Allow Claims]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Hearing on a Judge Taddonio Case Set by Attorney or Trustee]
    Date Published:January 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Crawford, Rosemary C. [Certificate of No Objection]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?322238
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =