Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01627
    Party Name:KATZ v. UPMC et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?234108

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 2 =