open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:17-cv-04985
    Party Name:BRAZZELL v. ALLENTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Permit]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Permit]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?536386
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =