open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:18-cv-00686
    Party Name:DAVIS v. ALLENTOWN POLICE DEPT. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Waiver of Service]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?539561
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =