open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:18-cv-04576
    Party Name:Bratvold v. Allentown Police Department
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Take Deposition]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Of]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?548654
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =