Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:18-cv-05339
    Party Name:LEWYCKYJ v. DIOCESE OF ALLENTOWN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Of]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?550962
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =