Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00172
    Party Name:PREMIER ANESTHESIA, LLC v. PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?551861
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =