Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00153
    Party Name:TILLEY v. WALMART STORES EAST, LP
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?551860
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =