Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00029-1
    Party Name:USA v. CROTHERS
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Defender Association]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?551859
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =