Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:19-10217-mdc
    Party Name:Volodymyr Pavlovych Kurylo
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Close Case]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Close Case]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Exigent Circumstances re: Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13 Notice)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Requiring Documents]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Matrix]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Praecipe]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?486346
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =