Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:19-70018-
    Party Name:Rita Wasnick
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [none]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Pay Chapter 7 Installment for Cases Filed On or After 6/1/2014]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Attachment D]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Closed for No Asset Cases]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Amended Schedules A B C G H I J]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Update Statement of Intent Deadline]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Walsh, James R. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?359197
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =