open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00593
    Party Name:PATTERSON v. AR RESOURCES, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Arbitration]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Eligible for Arbitration]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Attorney)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?553054
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =