Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00592
    Party Name:PATTERSON v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Eligible for Arbitration]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Attorney)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?553053
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =