open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:19-10867-elf
    Party Name:Bryan Keith DiCesare and Lesley Elizabeth DiCesare
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Case Reassignment Notice for Pro Se (multi)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Transfer case from Judge Fehling to Frank]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Reply]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Set]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, (Chapter 13) SCOTT F. [Praecipe]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Generic Motion ]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Dismiss Case for Other]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Reclassify Claims]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Certificate of Service of Proof of Claim]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Amended Order]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Statement Of Reasons In Support of Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Response]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Reply]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Scheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Schedules AB - J]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Declaration - Form 119]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Sanctions]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Contempt]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Hearing to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Requiring Documents]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Notice to Individual Debtor]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Pro Se Statement]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Matrix]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: WATERMAN, SCOTT [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?487017
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =