Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01070
    Party Name:ALAMEDA et al v. TW CONSTRUCTION, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?554342
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =