Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01080
    Party Name:SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS v. MORETTI et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?554341
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =