Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01077
    Party Name:MYERS v. GARMAN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record - Prisoner]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Prisoner State Record]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?554336
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =