Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00160-1
    Party Name:USA v. PEREZ-TORRES
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?554334
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =