open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01582
    Party Name:WEXLER v. PRICE
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?555620
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =