open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01562
    Party Name:DEROCHA v. ETHICON, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?555618
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =