open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:19-cv-01607
    Party Name:GETTING GRACE FILM, LLC v. HANNOVER HOUSE, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?555604
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =