open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02097
    Party Name:NAJARIAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Record]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Magistrate Consent]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Order Directing Consent to be Filed]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedural Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Notice of Case Assignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?556848
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =