open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02093
    Party Name:CABALLERO v. EAST COAST WINGS & GRILL et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?556845
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =