open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02544
    Party Name:WILEY v. COLVIN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Crossclaim]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Eligible for Arbitration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?557994
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =