open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00167-2
    Party Name:USA v. JAMEA et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Warrant]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?257181
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =