open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00540-1
    Party Name:USA v. BERMUDEZ
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Order for Presentence Investigation]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?557996
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =