open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00163-1
    Party Name:USA v. VANDERSLICE et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Remark]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Rule 40]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?256966
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =