open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00160-1
    Party Name:USA v. LEAVY, et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?256931
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =