open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03653
    Party Name:STYER v. TRATTORIA SAN DOMENICO, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?560540
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =