open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03658
    Party Name:RIVERA v. SAUL
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief and Statement]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Record]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [US Marshal Return]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedural Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Notice of Case Assignment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?560557
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =