open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-00808-dd
    Party Name:Naeema Muhammad
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge/Closing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Discharging Debtor 7/Trustee/Closing Case (order)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Dissolving Rule to Show Cause (order)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Filing Fee - Installment Payment]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Show Cause Order w/pdf image]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Installment Payment Received]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Pay Filing Fees in Installment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?287937
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =