open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-00813-dd
    Party Name:Thomas Herbert Crabtree and Kristi Hannon Crabtree
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Hearing Notice (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Modified Plan]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Confirmation Hearing Held]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [TO - CII Order And Continued Confirmation Hearing (DD)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Settlement of Objection to Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Confirmation Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Deficiency Notice (General)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Chapter 13 Stmt of Income/Calculation]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Schedules/Statements Filed]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Extend Time]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [UST/Trustee Notice of Filings Due]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?287942
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =