Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-00812-jw
    Party Name:Henry McCray
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Request for Order Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Chapter 13 Stmt of Income/Calculation]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Schedules/Statements Filed]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice and Motion for Dismissal at Confirmation]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [UST/Trustee Notice of Filings Due]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Procedures for Loss Mitigation/Mortgage Modification (order)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?287941
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =