open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03160-jw
    Party Name:Keith Negel Green
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Settlement of Objection to Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Order Giving Debtor Notice of Possible Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account - Dismissed]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [TO - CIII Order Dismissing Case (ADI)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Trustee Request For C-III Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Confirmation Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Confirmation Hearing Held (batch)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Trustee's Notice of Intent to Request Dismissal at Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Pay Wages To Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Trustees Proposed Order To Pay]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Chapter 13 Stmt of Income/Calculation]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Schedules/Statements Filed]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Notice and Motion for Dismissal at Confirmation]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Procedures for Loss Mitigation/Mortgage Modification (order)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?287939
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =