open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-00809-dd
    Party Name:Tinisha Lavette Micheals
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Discharging Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account - Converted]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion Ch. 12/13 to Ch. 7 EXECUTED]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Chapter 7 Stmt of Income/Means Test]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Chapter 7 Stmt of Income/Means Test]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Anderson, Robert F. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion Ch 13 to Ch. 7]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Notice of Voluntary Conversion Ch 13 to Ch. 7]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Confirmation Hearing Held]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [TO - CIV Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [TO - CI Order And Continued Confirmation Hearing (DD)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Confirmation Hearing Held (batch)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Settlement Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Response]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Pay Wages To Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Deficiency Notice (General)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Trustees Proposed Order To Pay]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Assume Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Chapter 13 Stmt of Income/Calculation]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Schedules/Statements Filed]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Extend Time]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [UST/Trustee Notice of Filings Due]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?287938
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =