open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03159-dd
    Party Name:Ernest Samuel Weaver, III and Jamie Leigh Weaver
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (order)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Request for Order Confirming Plan]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Settlement of Objection to Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Hearing Notice (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Modified Plan]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Assume Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290322
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =