open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03158-dd
    Party Name:Anthony Kevin Byrd and April Pinkerton Byrd
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Hearing Notice (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Modified Plan]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [TO - CII Order And Continued Confirmation Hearing (DD)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Confirmation Hearing Held (batch)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Objection to Claim (with passive hearing notice)]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Settlement of Objection to Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Pay Wages To Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Trustees Proposed Order To Pay]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Restrict Public Access (order)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Restrict Public Access/Redact]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Consent Allowing Payment of Funds to Creditor/Debtor Attorney - Conduit]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290321
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =